For immediate release |
13 October 2021 |
Watkin Jones plc
('Watkin Jones' or the 'Group')
Confirmation of Board Changes
Further to the announcement on 19 July 2021, Watkin Jones plc (AIM:WJG) confirms the following changes to its Board of Directors.
Following an orderly handover, Alan Giddins, Non-executive Director, has assumed the role of Chair and Grenville Turner has retired from the Board, both with effect from 12 October 2021.
Sarah Sergeant joined the Board on 6 October 2021 as Chief Financial Officer Designate. Phil Byrom, Chief Financial Officer, will step down from the Board after a suitable handover period.
For further information:
Watkin Jones plc |
|
|
Richard Simpson, Chief Executive Officer |
Tel: +44 (0) 20 3617 4453 |
|
Phil Byrom, Chief Financial Officer |
||
|
|
|
Peel Hunt LLP (Nominated Adviser & Joint Corporate Broker) |
Tel: +44 (0) 20 7418 8900 |
|
Mike Bell / Ed Allsopp |
||
|
|
|
Jefferies Hoare Govett (Joint Corporate Broker) |
Tel: +44 (0) 20 7029 8000 |
|
Max Jones / Will Soutar
|
||
|
|
|
Media enquiries:
Buchanan |
|
Henry Harrison-Topham / Richard Oldworth Jamie Hooper / Steph Whitmore |
Tel: +44 (0) 20 7466 5000 |
watkinjones@buchanan.uk.com |
www.buchanan.uk.com |
RNS may use your IP address to confirm compliance with the terms and conditions, to analyse how you engage with the information contained in this communication, and to share such analysis on an anonymised basis with others as part of our commercial services. For further information about how RNS and the London Stock Exchange use the personal data you provide us, please see our Privacy Policy.