20 March 2020
BT GROUP PLC
NOTIFICATION UNDER LISTING RULE 9.6.13
BT Group plc announces the following details in respect of Sir Ian Cheshire, who was appointed as a non-executive director of BT Group plc on 16 March 2020, and Sara Weller CBE, who will join as a non-executive director of BT Group plc on or around 16 July 2020.
Directorships of publicly quoted companies in the last five years:
Director and Company |
Appointed |
Resigned |
Sir Ian Cheshire |
||
Barclays Bank UK plc |
03 April 2017 |
- |
Barclays Bank plc |
03 April 2017 |
01 April 2018 |
Barclays plc |
03 April 2017 |
- |
Menhaden plc |
03 October 2014 |
- |
Debenhams plc |
14 January 2016 |
10 January 2019, prior to a Company Voluntary Arrangement in May 2019 |
Whitbread plc |
01 February 2011 |
21 September 2017 |
Sara Weller CBE |
||
Bank of Scotland plc |
01 February 2012 |
- |
HBOS plc |
01 February 2012 |
- |
Lloyds Bank plc |
01 February 2012 |
- |
Lloyds Banking Group plc |
01 February 2012 |
- |
United Utilities Group plc |
01 March 2012 |
- |
There is no additional information to disclose in respect of Listing Rule 9.6.13 for Sir Ian Cheshire or Sara Weller CBE.
This information is provided by RNS, the news service of the London Stock Exchange. RNS is approved by the Financial Conduct Authority to act as a Primary Information Provider in the United Kingdom. Terms and conditions relating to the use and distribution of this information may apply. For further information, please contact rns@lseg.com or visit www.rns.com.